This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2022 at 08:35:23 (UTC).

JOSEY CHAPPELL, AN INDIVIDUAL, VS TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 JOSEY CHAPPELL, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5546

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAPPELL JOSEY

Defendants

TRADER JOE'S COMPANY

TRADER JOE'S EAST INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HILAIRE MIKA M.

HILAIRE MIKA MARIE

Defendant Attorneys

DARROW TANJA LAVONNE

WADDELL GRACE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/29/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/12/2022

5/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/12/2022

Notice of Appearance

5/17/2022: Notice of Appearance

Answer

5/27/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

4/13/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

4/11/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); C...)

4/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); C...)

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

1/13/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/14/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Case Management Statement

3/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

3/14/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/14/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • Hearing09/18/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • Hearing09/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Mika Marie Hilaire (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by TRADER JOE'S COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JOSEY CHAPPELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 68; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TRADER JOE'S COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by JOSEY CHAPPELL, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JOSEY CHAPPELL, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, a California Corporation (Defendant); TRADER JOE'S EAST, INC., a Massachusetts Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOSEY CHAPPELL, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOSEY CHAPPELL, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOSEY CHAPPELL, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOSEY CHAPPELL, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSEY CHAPPELL, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRADER JOE'S EAST INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRADER JOE'S COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WADDELL GRACE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DARROW TANJA LAVONNE