This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:12:13 (UTC).

JOSEPHINE ROCKFOLD CAMPBELL ET AL VS TRACY S THOMAS ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/16/2017 JOSEPHINE ROCKFOLD CAMPBELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRACY S THOMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8826

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

CAMPBELL MONTANA

CAMPBELL JOSEPHINE ROCKFOLD

Respondents and Defendants

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

DOES 1 TO 20

THOMAS TRACY S.

EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL COMPANY DOE 1

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION DOE 2

Minor

CAMPBELL STEVIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

COWAN PAUL ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DONAVAN MONIQUE R.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/16/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

11/17/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Minute Order

3/22/2019: Minute Order

Notice

3/22/2019: Notice

Answer

10/24/2018: Answer

PROOF OF SERVICE

9/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/19/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service

9/19/2018: Proof of Service

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/19/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/13/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Proof of Service

8/9/2018: Proof of Service

TRACYS, THOMAS' ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF JOSEPHINE ROCKFOLD-CAMPBELL, MONTANA CAMPBELL AND STEVIE CAMPBELL

3/27/2018: TRACYS, THOMAS' ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF JOSEPHINE ROCKFOLD-CAMPBELL, MONTANA CAMPBELL AND STEVIE CAMPBELL

FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE

2/9/2018: FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS

1/12/2018: SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GAUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

11/17/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GAUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Trial-related Dates) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and All Tri...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Order); Filed by TRACY S. THOMAS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) (Proposed order and stip to continue trial FSC); Filed by TRACY S. THOMAS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Exxonmobil Chemical Company (Doe 1) (Defendant); Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Doe 2) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketAPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GAUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOSEPHINE ROCKFOLD CAMPBELL (Plaintiff); MONTANA CAMPBELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8826    Hearing Date: January 17, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOSEPHINE ROCKHOLD-CAMPBELL, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

TRACY S. THOMAS, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****8826

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINORS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 17, 2020

Plaintiffs, Josephine Rockfold-Campbell, Montana Campbell, and Stevie Campbell filed this action against Defendants, Tracy S. Thomas and EAN Holdings, LLC for damages arising out of an automobile accident. Stevie is a minor and is appearing in the action through her mother, Josephine.

Stevie has agreed to settle her case with one or more of the defendants for $7413. If the settlement is approved, $1138.25 will be used for medical expenses and $1853 for attorneys’ fees; the net balance of $4323.75 will be paid to Josephine, without bond.

The petition is denied without prejudice for the following reasons:

· ¶12b is not completely filled out. ¶12(b)(4) should be checked. Additionally, the Court cannot locate Attachment 12, which must state the reasons for the apportionment of the settlement proceeds between the various plaintiffs. Petitioner must explain, by way of details about the various parties’ injuries, why she is receiving $55,000 when the other two plaintiffs are receiving must less.

· ¶14b is insufficiently filled out. Counsel seeks to recover $1853 in costs, but the costs are not itemized. The Court cannot locate Attachment 14b, which must be filed if the costs cannot be itemized in ¶14b.

· If Petitioner re-files the petition, Petitioner must use the outlines feature on the e-filing system so the Court can easily review the exhibits to the petition.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COWAN PAUL