This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2022 at 21:38:42 (UTC).

JOSEPHINE RAMOS, ET AL. VS RENT-A-CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 JOSEPHINE RAMOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RENT-A-CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9177

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAMOS JOSEPHINE

TAYLOR MARK JR.

Defendants

COSTA CARLO

RENT-A-CENTER

RENT-A-CENTER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN JANFAZA ILAN N

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/10/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

6/10/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/10/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2024
  • Hearing06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2023
  • Hearing12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOSEPHINE RAMOS (Plaintiff); MARK TAYLOR, Jr. (Plaintiff); MARK TAYLOR, III, a minor, by Mark Taylor Jr., as his guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSEPHINE RAMOS (Plaintiff); MARK TAYLOR, Jr. (Plaintiff); MARK TAYLOR, III, a minor, by Mark Taylor Jr., as his guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rent-A-Center East, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN JANFAZA ILAN N