This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 18:45:09 (UTC).

JOSEPHINA GONZALEZ VS BOULEVARD AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOULEVARD CADILLAC BUICK GMC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 JOSEPHINA GONZALEZ filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against BOULEVARD AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOULEVARD CADILLAC BUICK GMC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1327

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ JOSEPHINA

Defendants

BOULEVARD AUTOMOTIVE GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOULEVARD CADILLAC BUICK GMC

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

Defendant Attorney

MAJOR CAMERON

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

11/23/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

11/28/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

12/20/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: JOSEPHINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: JOSEPHINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BOULEVARD AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, a California Corporation dba BOULEVARD CADILLAC BUICK GMC (Defendant); GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOSEPHINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BOULEVARD AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, a California Corporation dba BOULEVARD CADILLAC BUICK GMC (Defendant); GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOSEPHINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BOULEVARD AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, a California Corporation dba BOULEVARD CADILLAC BUICK GMC (Defendant); GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSEPHINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BOULEVARD AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, a California Corporation dba BOULEVARD CADILLAC BUICK GMC (Defendant); GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: JOSEPHINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BOULEVARD AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, a California Corporation dba BOULEVARD CADILLAC BUICK GMC (Defendant); GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOULEVARD AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC DBA BOULEVARD CADILLAC BUICK GMC is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRNOS ROGER