This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 18:06:48 (UTC).

JOSEPH SERRATO VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 JOSEPH SERRATO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8196

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SERRATO JOSEPH

Defendants

ALPHA BETA COMPANY

M703 KROGER WEST

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY DBA RALPHS

RSH PROPERTIES I LLC

RSH RALPHS PROPERTIES I LLC

THE KROGER CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEOULLA DANIEL DANNY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/15/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/4/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2024
  • Hearing10/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joseph Serrato (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joseph Serrato (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joseph Serrato (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joseph Serrato (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M703 KROGER WEST/RALPHS is a litigant

Latest cases where ALPHA BETA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant