This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2022 at 04:51:46 (UTC).

JOSEPH P. CASTRO VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 JOSEPH P CASTRO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0678

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTRO JOSEPH P.

Defendants

ANAHEIM HILLS JAGUAR LAND ROVER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA JAGUAR LAND ROVER ANAHEIM HILLS

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARNELL STEPHEN

Defendant Attorneys

CRONIN COLIN P.

TAKAHASHI BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

8/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/22/2021: Answer

Answer - ANSWER ANAHEIM HILLS JAGUAR LAND ROVER, INC. DBA JAGUAR LAND ROVER ANAHEIM HILLS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/7/2021: Answer - ANSWER ANAHEIM HILLS JAGUAR LAND ROVER, INC. DBA JAGUAR LAND ROVER ANAHEIM HILLS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

12/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

12/14/2021: Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/1/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • Hearing03/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by STEPHEN PARNELL (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order Trial Preparation]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketOrder (Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Anaheim Hills Jaguar Land Rover, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Joseph P. Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Joseph P. Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Joseph P. Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer (ANAHEIM HILLS JAGUAR LAND ROVER, INC. DBA JAGUAR LAND ROVER ANAHEIM HILLS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT); Filed by Anaheim Hills Jaguar Land Rover, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joseph P. Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joseph P. Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joseph P. Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joseph P. Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joseph P. Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anaheim Hills Jaguar Land Rover, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARNELL STEPHEN