Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2021 at 17:41:41 (UTC).

JOSEPH MILTON VS 240 S. CATALINA, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 JOSEPH MILTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 240 S CATALINA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6402

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILTON JOSEPH

Defendant

240 S. CATALINA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DAVID

Defendant Attorney

STARK PATRICK J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/4/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

8/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/25/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/15/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 240 S. CATALINA, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOSEPH MILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOSEPH MILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by JOSEPH MILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOSEPH MILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSEPH MILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOSEPH MILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less