Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2020 at 01:30:45 (UTC).

JOSEPH L. ROCCO VS FATHOM INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 JOSEPH L ROCCO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FATHOM INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8206

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROCCO AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROCCO FAMILY TRUST U/A

Defendants

FATHOM INVESTMENT GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SANCHEZ ROCKY H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAKIMI HELGA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

12/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/4/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/20/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/22/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/8/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/8/2019: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • Hearing02/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: re: Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joseph L. Rocco, as Trustee of the Rocco Family Trust U/A dated July 9, 2004 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joseph L. Rocco, as Trustee of the Rocco Family Trust U/A dated July 9, 2004 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Joseph L. Rocco, as Trustee of the Rocco Family Trust U/A dated July 9, 2004 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Joseph L. Rocco, as Trustee of the Rocco Family Trust U/A dated July 9, 2004 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Joseph L. Rocco, as Trustee of the Rocco Family Trust U/A dated July 9, 2004 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Joseph L. Rocco, as Trustee of the Rocco Family Trust U/A dated July 9, 2004 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joseph L. Rocco, as Trustee of the Rocco Family Trust U/A dated July 9, 2004 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joseph L. Rocco, as Trustee of the Rocco Family Trust U/A dated July 9, 2004 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joseph L. Rocco, as Trustee of the Rocco Family Trust U/A dated July 9, 2004 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV28206    Hearing Date: October 05, 2020    Dept: 73

10/5/2020

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

JOSEPH L. ROCCO, AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROCCO FAMILY TRUST U/A DATED JULY 9, 2004 v. FATHOM INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC, et. al. (19STCV28206)

Counsel for Plaintiff/moving party: Jeff Berke, Esq., Helga Hakimi (BerkeHakimi)

Counsel for Defendants/opposing parties: N/A

OSC/REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (filed 9/1/2020)

Having reviewed Plaintiff’s Request for Default Judgment, the court finds that the Proposed Judgment (lodged 9/1/2020) is supported by the evidence submitted and based thereon, approves and GRANTS the request as set forth in the proposed judgment. The court intends to sign the proposed judgment submitted.

The OSC is discharged. No appearance is necessary. No further dates.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAKIMI HELGA