This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2023 at 11:04:53 (UTC).

JOSEPH KAMELGARD VS OSHER BAR & GRILL LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 JOSEPH KAMELGARD filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against OSHER BAR GRILL LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0464

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAMELGARD JOSEPH

Defendants

BEN CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BLVD.CAFE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA MONACO ENCINO DBA THE BOULEVARD CAFE

ELISHA OREN BEN

ELISHA YOSEF BEN

LA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OSHER BAR & GRILL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THE BOULEVARD CAFE AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCUS STEPHEN

Defendant Attorney

BEROKIM KOUSHA

 

Court Documents

Order - CLERKS APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER

8/2/2023: Order - CLERKS APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/28/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/31/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

7/25/2023: Answer

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/26/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/26/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/28/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

6/23/2023: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Case Management Statement

8/28/2023: Case Management Statement

Order - CLERKS APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER

8/2/2023: Order - CLERKS APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/25/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/25/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/25/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/25/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/25/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/25/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/25/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/9/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2023
  • Hearing09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Joseph Kamelgard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- CLERKS APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER: As To Parties changed from Ben Construction, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant), La Construction Services, Inc, a California corporation (Defendant), Oren Ben Elisha (Defendant), Yosef Ben Elisha (Defendant), BLVD.CAFE, a California corporation (Defendant) to Ben Construction, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant), Oren Ben Elisha (Defendant), BLVD.CAFE, a California corporation (Defendant), La Construction Services, Inc, a California corporation (Defendant), Yosef Ben Elisha (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketCLERKS APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Oren Ben Elisha (Defendant); Yosef Ben Elisha (Defendant); BLVD.CAFE, a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Joseph Kamelgard on 02/17/2023, Default entered on 07/25/2023, Vacated - .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Joseph Kamelgard on 02/17/2023, Default entered on 07/25/2023, Vacated - .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Joseph Kamelgard on 02/17/2023, Default entered on 07/25/2023, Vacated - .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Joseph Kamelgard on 02/17/2023, Default entered on 07/25/2023, Vacated - .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Joseph Kamelgard on 02/17/2023, Default entered on 07/25/2023, Vacated - .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Joseph Kamelgard (Plaintiff); As to: Osher Bar & Grill LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Oren Ben Elisha (Defendant); Yosef Ben Elisha (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 02/27/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Joseph Kamelgard (Plaintiff); As to: Osher Bar & Grill LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Oren Ben Elisha (Defendant); Yosef Ben Elisha (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Joseph Kamelgard (Plaintiff); As to: Osher Bar & Grill LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Oren Ben Elisha (Defendant); Yosef Ben Elisha (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Joseph Kamelgard (Plaintiff); As to: Osher Bar & Grill LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Oren Ben Elisha (Defendant); Yosef Ben Elisha (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mitchell L. Beckloff in Department 86 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less