This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 04:21:35 (UTC).

JOSEPH J JABLONSKI, JR VS CLAREMEONT GRADUATE UNIVERSITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 JOSEPH J JABLONSKI, JR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CLAREMEONT GRADUATE UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8924

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JABLONSKI JOSEPH J JR

JABLONSKI JOSEPH J JR.

Defendants

SCHROEDEL JEAN

CLAREMEONT GRADUATE UNIVERSITY

THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL UHLMANN A DECEASED INDIVIDUAL

CAMPBELL HEATHER

THE ESTATE OF OF MICHAEL UHLMANN

CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY

SAN BERNARDINO

CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY SAN BERNARDINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIT BRIAN M.

Defendant Attorneys

BRENNER JONATHAN MORRIS

MANOLATOU VANESSA KATERINA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SIGNING OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL) OF 09/09/2021

9/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SIGNING OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL) OF 09/09/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SIGNING OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL)

9/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SIGNING OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL)

Judgment - FINAL JUDGMENT

9/9/2021: Judgment - FINAL JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER COURT'S OWN MOTION PURS. TO CCP SEC...)

8/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER COURT'S OWN MOTION PURS. TO CCP SEC...)

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF JOSEPH J. JABLONSKI, JR.S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/21/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF JOSEPH J. JABLONSKI, JR.S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF JOSEPH J. JABLONSKI, JR.

7/21/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF JOSEPH J. JABLONSKI, JR.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); HEA...)

7/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); HEA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 08/11/2021

8/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 08/11/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Case Management Statement

7/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN M. HEIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY, SAN BERNARDINO AS A DEFENDANT

7/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN M. HEIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY, SAN BERNARDINO AS A DEFENDANT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN M. HEIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN M. HEIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY, SAN BERNANDINO AS A PARTY TO THIS SUIT

7/16/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY, SAN BERNANDINO AS A PARTY TO THIS SUIT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/16/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; NOTICE OF RE-SETTING OF CMC) OF 07/07/2021

7/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; NOTICE OF RE-SETTING OF CMC) OF 07/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; NOTICE OF RE-SETTING OF CMC)

7/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; NOTICE OF RE-SETTING OF CMC)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/9/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

5/28/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReSigning of Judgment of Dismissal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Signing of Judgment of Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Signing of Judgment of Dismissal) of 09/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Filed by Claremeont Graduate University (Defendant); Jean Schroedel (Defendant); Heather Campbell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Court's Own Motion Purs. to CCP Sections 436 and 438) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Court's Own Motion Purs. to CCP Sec...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/27/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Claremeont Graduate University (Defendant); Jean Schroedel (Defendant); Heather Campbell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Joseph J Jablonski, JR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Joseph J Jablonski, JR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joseph J Jablonski, JR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joseph J Jablonski, JR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joseph J Jablonski, JR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLAREMONT GRADUATE UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEIT BRIAN M.