This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 00:52:35 (UTC).

JOSEPH GOMES ET AL VS THI HUYEN TRAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 JOSEPH GOMES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THI HUYEN TRAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1776

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOMES JOSEPH

GOMES CORIN

Defendants

TRAN THI HUYEN

TRAN LONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREENE MARY ELIZABETH

NEWHOUSE TREVOR JACOB

Defendant Attorney

VARDANYAN GEVORG S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/26/2018: Complaint

Summons

1/26/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

3/5/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

3/5/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Answer

5/7/2018: Answer

Other -

5/7/2018: Other -

Request for Dismissal

6/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joseph Gomes (Plaintiff); Corin Gomes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Thi Huyen Tran (Defendant); Long Tran (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Thi Huyen Tran (Defendant); Long Tran (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Joseph Gomes (Plaintiff); Corin Gomes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Joseph Gomes (Plaintiff); Corin Gomes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joseph Gomes (Plaintiff); Corin Gomes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARDANYAN GEVORG S