This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:24:54 (UTC).

JOSEPH FLORES ET AL VS MARCUS JEFFREY LAMOUR ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 JOSEPH FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARCUS JEFFREY LAMOUR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4986

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SAJORDA JOHNSON

FLORES JOSEPH

Defendants and Respondents

WANG BOQUN

HE MINGFANG

DOES 1 TO 50

LAMOUR MARCUS JEFFREY

ABOUCHAIN ANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ARTIS TAB L. ESQ.

FRANDSEN RUSSELL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/6/2017: Complaint

Summons

9/6/2017: Summons

CoverSheet

9/6/2017: CoverSheet

Proof of Service

6/8/2018: Proof of Service

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANTS BOOIJN WANG AND MINGFANG HE ONLY

3/14/2018: PROOF OF NON-SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANTS BOOIJN WANG AND MINGFANG HE ONLY

Minute Order

5/24/2019: Minute Order

Declaration re: Due Diligence

5/9/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Notice

4/22/2019: Notice

Minute Order

2/20/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

2/15/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

2/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Substitution of Attorney

1/24/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

1/24/2019: Substitution of Attorney

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Joseph Flores (Plaintiff); Johnson Sajorda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Notice (Plaintiffs' Notice of Not Found or Non-Service Return re Defandant Boqun Wang (Arcadia address)); Filed by Joseph Flores (Plaintiff); Johnson Sajorda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Joseph Flores (Plaintiff); Johnson Sajorda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Joseph Flores (Plaintiff); Johnson Sajorda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Johnson Sajorda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Joseph Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Joseph Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANTS BOOIJN WANG AND MINGFANG HE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Joseph Flores (Plaintiff); Johnson Sajorda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Joseph Flores (Plaintiff); Johnson Sajorda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Joseph Flores (Plaintiff); Johnson Sajorda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTIS TAB L. ESQ.