This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 00:26:54 (UTC).

JOSEPH DEAN TERRY ET AL VS MEADOWBROOK MEAT COMPANY INC ET A

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 JOSEPH DEAN TERRY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MEADOWBROOK MEAT COMPANY INC ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7424

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

TERRY JENNIFER

TERRY JOSEPH DEAN

Respondents and Defendants

RYDER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES

MCLANE COMPANY INC.

MEADOWBROOK MEAT COMPANY INC.

MEJIA ERNESTO

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

CARLSON C. RAY ESQ.

BULONE CHRISTOPHER VINCENT

Defendant Attorneys

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

SMITH KEVIN D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

5/30/2019: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application

5/24/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

5/24/2019: Minute Order

Opposition

5/23/2019: Opposition

Motion to Compel

5/13/2019: Motion to Compel

Minute Order

2/8/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

2/6/2019: Ex Parte Application

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

10/3/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

7/25/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Unknown

7/25/2018: Unknown

Unknown

7/23/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANTS MEADOWBROOK MEAT COMPANY, INC. AND ERNESTO MEJIA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

9/6/2017: DEFENDANTS MEADOWBROOK MEAT COMPANY, INC. AND ERNESTO MEJIA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

8/4/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

7/28/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/17/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Meadowbrook Meat Company, Inc. (Defendant); Ernesto Mejia (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and all trial related dates and deadlines) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial and all tri...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Trial Related Dates); Filed by Meadowbrook Meat Company, Inc. (Defendant); Ernesto Mejia (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Ex Parte Application of Defendant Meadowbrook Meat Company, Inc., to Continue Trial); Filed by Joseph Dean Terry (Plaintiff); Jennifer Terry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Physical and Mental Examinations of Plaintiff Joseph Dean Terry); Filed by Meadowbrook Meat Company, Inc. (Defendant); Ernesto Mejia (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and all Trial Related Dates and Deadlines) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and all Tri...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Joseph Dean Terry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Joseph Dean Terry (Plaintiff); Jennifer Terry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Joseph Dean Terry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joseph Dean Terry (Plaintiff); Jennifer Terry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7424    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 5

Joseph Dean Terry v. Meadowbrook Meat Company, Inc., et al.

Case No. ****7424

This case will be transferred to an Independent Calendar court.  Therefore, the Court will not hear the pending ex parte applications on Monday, December 16, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. 



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEADOWBROOK MEAT COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RYDERS TRANSPORTATION SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where RYDER TRUCK RENTAL LT is a litigant

Latest cases where McLane Company, Inc. is a litigant