Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 13:01:43 (UTC).

JOSEPH CADDEN VS IWP CAPITAL, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 JOSEPH CADDEN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against IWP CAPITAL, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7680

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CADDEN JOSEPH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NAVARRO FAUSTO

FCI LENDER SERVICES INC.

IWP CAPITAL LLC

INVESTMENT BANKERS NETWORK INC. AKA INBANET

FIRST CAPITAL TRUST DEEDS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

FCI LENDER SERVICES INC.

IWP CAPITAL LLC

FIRST CAPITAL TRUST DEEDS

LOPEZ MICHAEL ANTHONY

CESENA CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMART DAVID LEN

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

WRIGHT MICHAEL

GOERLINGER JULIE A.

 

Court Documents

Answer

3/12/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/12/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/6/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

4/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

4/7/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

4/7/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

2/10/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/6/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Mail

1/7/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

1/7/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/14/2020: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • Hearing04/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Hearing04/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Joseph Cadden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Joseph Cadden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Joseph Cadden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence); Filed by Joseph Cadden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Joseph Cadden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Joseph Cadden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Joseph Cadden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Joseph Cadden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FCI LENDER SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by FCI LENDER SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by IWP CAPITAL, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by IWP CAPITAL, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Joseph Cadden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joseph Cadden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joseph Cadden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCI LENDER SERVICES INC. is a litigant