This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2023 at 04:30:12 (UTC).

JOSEPH BUDDENBERG VS TARGET CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 JOSEPH BUDDENBERG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0016

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUDDENBERG JOSEPH

Defendants

ALLIED UNIVERSAL

DOE JOHN

TARGET CORPORATION

WATERMARK SECURITY GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHOBRIAL TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/23/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

12/23/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

12/23/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/21/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/1/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2024
  • Hearing12/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2024
  • Hearing06/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2024
  • Hearing06/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: JOSEPH BUDDENBERG (Plaintiff); As to: Watermark Security Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: JOSEPH BUDDENBERG (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JOSEPH BUDDENBERG (Plaintiff); As to: ALLIED UNIVERSAL (Defendant); Service Date: 03/14/2023; Service Cost: 129.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JOSEPH BUDDENBERG (Plaintiff); As to: TARGET CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 03/13/2023; Service Cost: 119.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOSEPH BUDDENBERG (Plaintiff); As to: TARGET CORPORATION (Defendant); ALLIED UNIVERSAL (Defendant); JOHN DOE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSEPH BUDDENBERG (Plaintiff); As to: TARGET CORPORATION (Defendant); ALLIED UNIVERSAL (Defendant); JOHN DOE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOSEPH BUDDENBERG (Plaintiff); As to: TARGET CORPORATION (Defendant); ALLIED UNIVERSAL (Defendant); JOHN DOE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less