This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2022 at 20:11:34 (UTC).

JOSEPH AHDOOT VS FRANCES ROSENKRANZ

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 JOSEPH AHDOOT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FRANCES ROSENKRANZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7916

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AHDOOT JOSEPH

Defendant

ROSENKRANZ FRANCES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AHDOOT ESQ. JASON D.

Defendant Attorney

POLI STEPHANIE S.

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/14/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/12/2022: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/12/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/5/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

12/5/2022: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

12/5/2022: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/4/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/31/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/31/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/31/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/31/2022: Complaint

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/31/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • Hearing05/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • Hearing01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Joseph Ahdoot (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jason D. Ahdoot, Esq. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketAddress for Jason D. Ahdoot, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Frances Rosenkranz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Frances Rosenkranz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Frances Rosenkranz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Frances Rosenkranz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketAddress for Jason D. Ahdoot, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Joseph Ahdoot (Plaintiff); As to: Frances Rosenkranz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Joseph Ahdoot (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Joseph Ahdoot (Plaintiff); As to: Frances Rosenkranz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Poli, Stephanie