This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 03:25:50 (UTC).

JOSEPH AARON GUTIERREZ VS NABIL BASHA RAFAIL

Case Summary

On 11/01/2017 JOSEPH AARON GUTIERREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NABIL BASHA RAFAIL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1427

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GUTIERREZ JOSEPH AARON

Defendants and Respondents

RAFAIL NABIL BASHA

DOES 1-10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SKURATOVSKY RITA ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SMITH JEFFREY B.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

4/16/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

4/16/2019: Ex Parte Application

Declaration

4/16/2019: Declaration

Notice of Ruling

4/22/2019: Notice of Ruling

Demand for Jury Trial

5/6/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/6/2019: Answer

CoverSheet

11/1/2017: CoverSheet

Summons

11/1/2017: Summons

Complaint

11/1/2017: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Nabil Basha Rafail (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Nabil Basha Rafail (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Joseph Aaron Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • at 11:18 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (By Plaintiff for Order to Continue Trial and related dates); Filed by Joseph Aaron Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Declaration (of Rita Skuratovsky in support of Ex parte Application); Filed by Joseph Aaron Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Application of Plaintiff to Continue Trial and Relat...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Joseph Aaron Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Joseph Aaron Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Joseph Aaron Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC681427    Hearing Date: January 27, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOSEPH AARON GUTIERREZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

NABIL BASHA RAFAIL, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC681427

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Dept. 31

10:00 a.m.

January 27, 2020

The parties participated in an IDC on 12/04/19. At the conclusion of the IDC, the Court issued a minute order indicating all issues were resolved, and Plaintiff was to take the motion off calendar upon receipt of further responses. The Court was originally scheduled to hear these motions to compel on 12/19/19. Prior to the hearing, the Court issued an order taking the motions off calendar because all issues had been resolved at the IDC. Both attorneys appeared at the hearing, and at the conclusion of the hearing the Court continued the matter to 1/27/20.

Neither party has filed any further brief concerning what issues remain unresolved at this time. The Court therefore continues the hearing again. The hearing is continued from 1/27/20 to Thursday, 2/27/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 31 of the Spring Street Courthouse. The Court orders the parties to file a joint statement of items in dispute at least one week prior to the continued hearing date. Pursuant to the newly-enacted CCP §§2023.300, 2031.310, and 2033.290, if the statement would otherwise be voluminous, the Court asks the parties to provide a concise outline of matters remaining in dispute rather than a joint statement.

The Court notes that trial is not scheduled until 5/21/20, and therefore time remains to resolve the issues relating to the MTCF prior to trial. The Court urges the parties to continue to meet and confer to resolve any remaining issues without the need for an additional hearing if at all possible.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Case Number: BC681427    Hearing Date: December 19, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOSEPH AARON GUTIERREZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

NABIL BASHA RAFAIL, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC681427

[TENTATIVE] ORDER TAKING MOTIONS TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 19, 2019

The parties participated in an IDC on 12/04/19. At the conclusion of the IDC, the Court issued a minute order indicating all issues were resolved, and Plaintiff was to take the motion off calendar upon receipt of further responses. To date, Plaintiff has not taken the motion off calendar, but no party has filed any further briefing concerning the status of the motions. The Court is hopeful that the parties have resolved their dispute, and intends to take the motions to compel off calendar. If the parties have not resolved their dispute, they must appear at the hearing on the motions and be prepared to discuss any remaining outstanding issues.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Case Number: BC681427    Hearing Date: December 04, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOSEPH AARON GUTIERREZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

NABIL BASHA RAFAIL, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC681427

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 4, 2019

Plaintiff has a motion to compel further responses on calendar 12/04/19. The Court continued the parties’ IDC from 11/22/19 to 12/04/19, the same day as the hearing on the MTCFs. The Court requires that IDCs go forward at least two weeks prior to substantive hearings on MTCFs.

The 12/04/19 hearing is continued to 12/18/19 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3. If this is not an available date for the parties to have the MTCFs heard, they must meet and confer to agree upon an alternative available date and use the online reservation system to continue the hearing on the motions.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.