This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/30/2022 at 10:22:06 (UTC).

JOSEFINA RODRIGUEZ, ET AL. VS W.E. O'NEIL CONSTRUCTION CO. OF CALIFORNIA, A DELAWARE CORPORATION;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 JOSEFINA RODRIGUEZ, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against W E O'NEIL CONSTRUCTION CO OF CALIFORNIA, A DELAWARE CORPORATION ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0640

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESCARATE ERLINDA

RODRIGUEZ JOSEFINA

Defendants

LARGO CONCRETE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MILLENNIUM REINFORCING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PHILENA JOINT VENTURE LLC A DELAWARE COMPANY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

W.E. O'NEIL CONSTRUCTION CO. OF CALIFORNIA A DELAWARE CORPORATION;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FARIAS JAIME G.

HOMAMPOUR ARASH

LINCORS DANIELLE NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/19/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Demand for Jury Trial

9/19/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/19/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

9/19/2022: Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR E.E.

9/30/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR E.E.

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/12/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2024
  • Hearing09/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2024
  • Hearing03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2024
  • Hearing03/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Josefina Rodriguez (Plaintiff); E. E. (Plaintiff); Erlinda Escarate (Plaintiff); As to: LARGO CONCRETE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/07/2022; Service Cost: 168.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Josefina Rodriguez (Plaintiff); E. E. (Plaintiff); Erlinda Escarate (Plaintiff); As to: MILLENNIUM REINFORCING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/07/2022; Service Cost: 211.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Josefina Rodriguez (Plaintiff); E. E. (Plaintiff); Erlinda Escarate (Plaintiff); As to: LARGO CONCRETE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/07/2022; Service Cost: 168.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Josefina Rodriguez (Plaintiff); E. E. (Plaintiff); Erlinda Escarate (Plaintiff); As to: PHILENA JOINT VENTURE LLC, a Delaware Company (Defendant); Service Date: 10/07/2022; Service Cost: 161.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Josefina Rodriguez (Plaintiff); E. E. (Plaintiff); Erlinda Escarate (Plaintiff); As to: W.E. O'NEIL CONSTRUCTION CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant); Service Date: 10/07/2022; Service Cost: 65.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Josefina Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/07/2022; Service Cost: 166.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Josefina Rodriguez (Plaintiff); E. E. (Plaintiff); Erlinda Escarate (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Josefina Rodriguez (Plaintiff); E. E. (Plaintiff); Erlinda Escarate (Plaintiff); As to: W.E. O'NEIL CONSTRUCTION CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant); LARGO CONCRETE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); MILLENNIUM REINFORCING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Josefina Rodriguez (Plaintiff); E. E. (Plaintiff); Erlinda Escarate (Plaintiff); As to: W.E. O'NEIL CONSTRUCTION CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant); LARGO CONCRETE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); MILLENNIUM REINFORCING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Josefina Rodriguez (Plaintiff); E. E. (Plaintiff); Erlinda Escarate (Plaintiff); As to: W.E. O'NEIL CONSTRUCTION CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant); LARGO CONCRETE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); MILLENNIUM REINFORCING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLENNIUM REINFORCING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where W.E.O'NEIL CONSTRUCTION CO OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where LARGO CONCRETE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant