Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2021 at 07:06:46 (UTC).

JOSE ZAVALA VS ADVANCE AUTO PARTS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 JOSE ZAVALA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ADVANCE AUTO PARTS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2704

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAVALA JOSE

Defendants

HOLLEY PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS INC.

HIMMEL MANAGEMENT CO. LLC AKA HIMMEL GROUP FORMERLY D/B/A MARTIN HIMMEL INC.

CHATTEM INC.

NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION LLC FKA NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC

PRESPERSE CORPORATION

O'REILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES INC.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

DCO LLC FKA DANA COMPANIES LLC

ADVANCE AUTO PARTS INC. DBA CARQUEST

ESTEE LAUDER INC.

M.A.C. COSMETICS INC.

THE PROCTOR & GAMBLE COMPANY

NOXELL CORPORATION FKA NOXZEMA CHEMICAL COMPANY

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC. FDBA G&G SPECIALTY PRODUCTS CO.

BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

PFIZER INC.

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PURDY STUART JAMES

Defendant Attorneys

EBRAHAMIAN SALIN

WILLIAMSON IAN G.

MOORADIAN ALINA

COGGSHALL WILLIAM LAMAR

PRINDLE KENNETH B.

RIDLEY SHAWN MICHAEL

GARRATT JUSTIN E.

ARMSTRONG WILLIAM H.

POND FRANCIS DENNIS

KATERNDAHL JOHN PAUL

LEE JAE HONG

DEJARDIN BRADFORD J.

ULLOA EDWARD RICHARD

POPOVICH JERRY CARL

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

NICHOLS STEPHEN MATTHEW

MURRIN CHARLES PATRICK

ONGARO DAVID RAYMOND

HUGO EDWARD ROGER

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: APPLICATION OF JENNA C. NEWMARK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

5/7/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: APPLICATION OF JENNA C. NEWMARK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

3/24/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

3/29/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF TRAVIS R. SMITH TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE

4/9/2021: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF TRAVIS R. SMITH TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION OF TRAVIS R. SMITH TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE AND TAKE PART IN CASE WITH LOCAL COUNSEL

4/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION OF TRAVIS R. SMITH TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE AND TAKE PART IN CASE WITH LOCAL COUNSEL

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

3/8/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Answer

3/9/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/2/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 02/26/2021

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 02/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • Hearing07/14/2021 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Hearing07/07/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Hearing07/07/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: Application of Jenna C. Newmark to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice); Filed by Estee Lauder, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Hearing - Other (on Application of Douglas B. King to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice and Take Part in Case with Local Counsel for Defendant Ralphs Grocery Company (Zavala-21STCV02704)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Hearing - Other (on Application of Travis R. Smith to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice and Take Part in Case with Local Counsel for Defendant Ralphs Grocery Company (Zavala-21STCV02704)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketOrder (Granting the Verified Application of Jenna C. Newmark to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice); Filed by Estee Lauder, Inc. (Defendant); M.A.C. Cosmetics Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing - Other on Application of Douglas B. King to Appear a...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Re: Motions to Quash Service of Summons); Filed by Jose Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Hearing - Other (on Application of Jenna C. Newmark to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Defendants The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. and M.A.C. Cosmetics Inc. ( Zavala-21STCV02704)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jose Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Minute Order Issued January 28, 2021); Filed by Jose Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jose Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC. FDBA G&G SPECIALTY PRODUCTS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where PRESPERSE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where M.A.C. COSMETICS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Himmel Management Co. LLC is a litigant