This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2021 at 21:53:20 (UTC).

JOSE VALDEZ VS SAS SERVICES LOS ANGELES, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 JOSE VALDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SAS SERVICES LOS ANGELES, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6473

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALDEZ JOSE

Defendant

SAS SERVICES LOS ANGELES INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTIERREZ MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

ADEL EVA A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/3/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND DOCUMENTS

7/28/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND DOCUMENTS

Answer

7/15/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • Hearing11/02/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Confidential Information and Documents); Filed by SAS SERVICES LOS ANGELES, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SAS SERVICES LOS ANGELES, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less