This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2023 at 09:44:20 (UTC).

JOSE TOVAR, VS BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 JOSE TOVAR, filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9696

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOVAR JOSE

Defendants

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DOE JOHN

GLENDALE II MALL ASSOCIATES LLC A DELWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WERBIN ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

AVILA MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/12/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/12/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/12/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/20/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2024
  • Hearing09/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2024
  • Hearing03/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: GLENDALE II MALL ASSOCIATES, LLC, A DELWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: JOSE TOVAR, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JOSE TOVAR, (Plaintiff); As to: GLENDALE II MALL ASSOCIATES, LLC, A DELWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 02/16/2023; Service Cost: 129.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JOSE TOVAR, (Plaintiff); As to: BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 02/10/2023; Service Cost: 179.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOSE TOVAR, (Plaintiff); As to: BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); GLENDALE II MALL ASSOCIATES, LLC, A DELWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); JOHN DOE, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSE TOVAR, (Plaintiff); As to: BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); GLENDALE II MALL ASSOCIATES, LLC, A DELWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); JOHN DOE, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOSE TOVAR, (Plaintiff); As to: BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); GLENDALE II MALL ASSOCIATES, LLC, A DELWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); JOHN DOE, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less