Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 07:43:39 (UTC).

JOSE SOTO VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 JOSE SOTO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5933

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOTO JOSE

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS STACEY S

Other Attorneys

NGUYEN ATHENA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES JOSE SOTO

5/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES JOSE SOTO

Case Management Statement

5/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

5/3/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

5/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Hearing01/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • Hearing10/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (JOSE SOTO); Filed by Jose Soto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jose Soto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Soto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Soto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Soto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Soto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NGUYEN ATHENA