This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 17:20:00 (UTC).

JOSE SILVA PLASCENCIA VS DELTA AIR LINES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 JOSE SILVA PLASCENCIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DELTA AIR LINES, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2613

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVA PLASCENCIA JOSE

Defendant

DELTA AIR LINES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHELLY THOMAS H.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/28/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

9/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2024
  • Hearing08/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Hearing02/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Silva Plascencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Silva Plascencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Silva Plascencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta Air Lines Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHELLY THOMAS H.