This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 17:08:23 (UTC).

JOSE SERRANO ET AL VS BRADLEY GERSZT ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 JOSE SERRANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BRADLEY GERSZT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, MARK A. BORENSTEIN, HUEY P. COTTON and THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4520

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

HUEY P. COTTON

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SERRANO JOSE

SERRANO ROMELIA

Defendants and Respondents

DUDLEY JON

BUSKAS BRYAN

GERSZT BRADLEY

BUSKAS EMILY

DOES 1 TO 10

DUDLEY W. COLLEEN

COLLEEN WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

VALENCIA EVERARDO VARGAS ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

SHERIDAN COLE R. ESQ.

SHERIDAN COLE R.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED

11/6/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

11/6/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 12/02/2019

12/2/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 12/02/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

12/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/29/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REASSIGNED HEARING DATE AND LOCATION FOR MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

1/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REASSIGNED HEARING DATE AND LOCATION FOR MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

1/30/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

Motion for Summary Judgment

4/10/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT IN SUPPORT OF MSJ

4/10/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT IN SUPPORT OF MSJ

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/20/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

3/21/2019: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED

4/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service

SUMMONS -

6/9/2017: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

6/9/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • Hearing07/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Hearing06/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Bradley Gerszt (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Bradley Gerszt (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Defendant in Support of MSJ); Filed by Bradley Gerszt (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Bradley Gerszt (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Counsel in Support of MSJ); Filed by Bradley Gerszt (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jose Serrano (Plaintiff); Romelia Serrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bradley Gerszt (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jose Serrano (Plaintiff); Romelia Serrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Jose Serrano (Plaintiff); Romelia Serrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint ((1st)); Filed by Jose Serrano (Plaintiff); Romelia Serrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC664520    Hearing Date: December 06, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the Northwest District, Van Nuys, JUDGE HUEY P. COTTON presiding in Department A for further reassignment to an IC courtroom. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.