This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2023 at 01:51:29 (UTC).

JOSE SANCHEZ VS LEONEL CASTELLANOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 JOSE SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEONEL CASTELLANOS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9012

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ JOSE

Defendants

CASTELLANOS LEONEL

NASSA INVESTMENTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORAVIAN CARLO ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/10/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/10/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/10/2022: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

8/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal with Prejudice: Name Extension: with Prejudice; As To Parties changed from Leonel Castellanos (Defendant), Nassa Investments, Inc. (Defendant) to Nassa Investments, Inc. (Defendant), Leonel Castellanos (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jose Sanchez on 06/10/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jose Sanchez as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jose Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Leonel Castellanos (Defendant); Nassa Investments, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Leonel Castellanos (Defendant); Nassa Investments, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Leonel Castellanos (Defendant); Nassa Investments, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Leonel Castellanos (Defendant); Nassa Investments, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less