This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2020 at 21:57:15 (UTC).

JOSE SALDANA GONZALEZ VS CAL-COAST CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 JOSE SALDANA GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CAL-COAST CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTIES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7971

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ JOSE SALDANA

Defendant

CAL-COAST CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HATANIAN FARZIN

BIBIYAN DAVID D.

Defendant Attorney

BENYAMINI PASCAL

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER

10/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

10/29/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUED HEARING) OF 09/28/2020

9/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUED HEARING) OF 09/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUED HEARING)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUED HEARING)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

9/23/2020: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/24/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS C...)

8/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS C...)

Substitution of Attorney

8/26/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE E-SERVICE PROVIDER)

5/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE E-SERVICE PROVIDER)

Initial Status Conference Report - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT BY DEFENDANT CAL-COAST CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTIES, INC.

11/15/2019: Initial Status Conference Report - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT BY DEFENDANT CAL-COAST CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTIES, INC.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

10/17/2019: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/22/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

8/27/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 06/12/2019 AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

6/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 06/12/2019 AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

6/12/2019: Initial Status Conference Order

Complaint

5/23/2019: Complaint

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order Granting Stipulation Compelling Arbitration and Dismissing Action Without Prejudice); Filed by Cal-Coast Construction Specialties, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Compelling Arbitration and Dismissing Action Without Prejudice); Filed by Jose Saldana Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Cal-Coast Construction Specialties, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:50 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance of Initial Status C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Court's Minute Order); Filed by Jose Saldana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 1:47 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continued Hearing) of 09/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Saldana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketNotice (of June 12, 2019, Minute Order and Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Jose Saldana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:59 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action) of 06/12/2019 and Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Saldana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Saldana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL-COAST CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HATANINA FARZIN ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIBIYAN DAVID D.