This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2020 at 00:05:32 (UTC).

JOSE RUBEN DORANTES VS ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 JOSE RUBEN DORANTES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8536

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DORANTES JOSE RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

LIONS GROUP PROTECTION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA LA GUARD PROTECTION INC.

DURRANI NASEER DBA AMERICORP INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPHSON JACK DAVID

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

7/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/15/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/26/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration - DECLARATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

2/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL JACK D. JOSEPHSON RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE

2/6/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL JACK D. JOSEPHSON RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

12/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...) OF 12/31/2019

12/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...) OF 12/31/2019

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

1/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Proof of Personal Service

1/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's Counsel's Failure to Appear)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's Failure to Take Defendants)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Jose Ruben Dorantes , , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Ruben Dorantes , , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Jose Ruben Dorantes , , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Ruben Dorantes , , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's Failure to Take Defendants) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's Counsel's Failure to Appear) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jose Ruben Dorantes , , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Ruben Dorantes , , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Ruben Dorantes , , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Ruben Dorantes , , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPHSON JACK DAVID