This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 14:56:27 (UTC).

JOSE RODRIGUEZ, ET AL. VS LAD- V LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 JOSE RODRIGUEZ, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against LAD-. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MORGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0695

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN MORGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ DE RODRIGUEZ MARTHA

RODRIGUEZ JOSE

Defendants

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

LAD- V LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA VOLKSWAGEN OF DOWNTOWN LA DBA VOLKSWAGEN OF DOWNTOWN LA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

Defendant Attorney

BRAVO EDUARDO A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Demand for Jury Trial

9/14/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/14/2022: Complaint

Answer

10/19/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/19/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/27/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

1/5/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2024
  • Hearing01/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2024
  • Hearing01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 01/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 updated: Result Date to 01/11/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: LAD- V LLC, a California Limited Liability Company dba Volkswagen of Downtown LA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Jose Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Martha Hernandez de Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jose Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Martha Hernandez de Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen Morgan in Department A14 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant), LAD- V LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant) to LAD- V LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant), VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant), LAD- V LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant) to VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant), LAD- V LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Martha Hernandez de Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Martha Hernandez de Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: LAD- V LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Jose Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Martha Hernandez de Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: LAD- V LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Martha Hernandez de Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: LAD- V LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less