This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 22:33:05 (UTC).

JOSE RIVERA VS JOE MORALES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 JOSE RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOE MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0729

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERA JOSE

Defendants

MORALES JOE

PEPSICO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2024
  • Hearing09/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • Hearing11/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEPSICO INC. A CALIFORNIA COROPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL