This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2021 at 18:02:52 (UTC).

JOSE RENTERIA VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ALCOHOL AND DRUG PROGRAMS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 JOSE RENTERIA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ALCOHOL AND DRUG PROGRAMS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9815

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENTERIA JOSE

Defendants

RIOS ROSA

SANCHEZ JOSIE

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ALCOHOL AND DRUG PROGRAMS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGANTE EDZYL JOSEF GONZALES

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint

8/12/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jose Renteria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Renteria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Renteria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Renteria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Renteria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ALCOHOL AND DRUG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAGANTE EDZYL JOSEF GONZALES