This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 04:35:41 (UTC).

JOSE RAMIREZ, ET AL. VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 JOSE RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6731

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REYES MARISOL

RAMIREZ JOSE

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CORRALES JESUS ANGEL REYES

DINH MICHAEL MINH QUANG

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION "CAL-TRANS"

GUY F. ATKINSON CONSTRUCTION LLC

REYES CORRALES JESUS ANGEL

STATEWIDE TRAFFIC AND SAFETY SIGNS INC.

HIGH-LIGHT ELECTRIC INC.

CAL STRIPE INC.

BC RENTALS LLC DBA BC TRAFFIC SPECIALISTS

CENTURY SWEEPING INC.

GLOBAL ENVIRONMENTAL NETWORK INC.

ATKINSON GUY F.

MOES 1-50

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOENS TIMOTHY

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

REISINGER ROBERT LEE

GUTIERREZ GIGI R.

AUSTIN DAVID ALLEN

LIPPERT TIMOTHY J.

SOMES RICHARD G

BEAL JEREMY

SIPES EDWARD E

LYNCH ROBERT

FRISHMAN DAVID MARK

BERGSTEN ROBERT T.

NG GERMAINE C.

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/12/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/12/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

1/4/2021: Answer

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

2/4/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/8/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSE RAMIREZ, TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES OFF CALENDAR

9/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, JOSE RAMIREZ, TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES OFF CALENDAR

Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) NOS. 15.1 AND 16.1

9/3/2020: Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) NOS. 15.1 AND 16.1

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/8/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Motion

5/22/2020: Notice of Motion

Answer

2/24/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/14/2019: PI General Order

Answer

11/19/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

11/21/2019: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Hearing08/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Hearing07/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by High-Light Electric, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Guy F. Atkinson Construction, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROPSED ORDER TO SET HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT); Filed by Cal Stripe, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by David Mark Frishman (Attorney); Guy F. Atkinson Construction, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by JOSE RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARISOL REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cal Stripe, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOSE RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARISOL REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOSE RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARISOL REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOSE RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARISOL REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSE RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARISOL REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JOSE RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARISOL REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOSE RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARISOL REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOSE RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARISOL REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSE RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); MARISOL REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL STRIPE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HIGH-LIGHT ELECTRIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GUY F. ATKINSON CONSTRUCTION LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where STATEWIDE TRAFFIC SAFETY AND SIGNS, INC. is a litigant