This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 15:47:14 (UTC).

JOSE RAFAEL SELVA SELVA VS IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES, LLC, A VIRGINIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 JOSE RAFAEL SELVA SELVA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES, LLC, A VIRGINIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9361

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELVA SELVA JOSE RAFAEL

Defendants

IKEA DISTRIBUTION SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

IKEA HOLDING US A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES LLC A VIRGINIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

IKEA PROPERTY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

IKEA PURCHASING SERVICES US INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

IKEA SUPPLY AG A SWITZERLAND CORPORATION

IKEA US RETAIL LLC A VIRGINIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

O'SHAUGHNESSY JEFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAFII DANIEL J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Request for Dismissal

3/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jose Rafael Selva Selva (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Rafael Selva Selva (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Rafael Selva Selva (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Rafael Selva Selva (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ikea Supply AG is a litigant

Latest cases where IKEA PURCHASING SERVICES US INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where IKEA DISTRIBUTION SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where IKEA U.S. RETAIL LLC is a litigant