Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 17:27:11 (UTC).

JOSE PADRON, ET AL. VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 JOSE PADRON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9435

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODRIGUEZ LISSETTE

PADRON JOSE

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOHEN ISAAC

Defendant Attorney

PROUDFOOT MATTHEW M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

7/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/08/2021

7/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/08/2021

Case Management Statement

7/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

7/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/15/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Demand for Jury Trial

4/7/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

4/7/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOSE PADRON (Plaintiff); LISSETTE RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JOSE PADRON (Plaintiff); LISSETTE RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSE PADRON (Plaintiff); LISSETTE RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOSE PADRON (Plaintiff); LISSETTE RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOSE PADRON (Plaintiff); LISSETTE RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant