This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 00:51:18 (UTC).

JOSE OSORIO VS ALHAMBRA FURNITURE GALLERY, INC., A TERMINATED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 JOSE OSORIO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ALHAMBRA FURNITURE GALLERY, INC , A TERMINATED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3853

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSORIO JOSE

Defendants

ALHAMBRA FURNITURE GALLERY INC. A TERMINATED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ALHAMBRA FURNITURE GALLERY

TSAI ALLEN DBA ALHAMBRA FURNITURE GALLERY

TSAI TONY DBA ALHAMBRA FURNITURE GALLERY

ZHOU LIAN DI DBA ALHAMBRA FURNITURE GALLERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/18/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/18/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/18/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration of Mailing - DECLARATION OF MAILING DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

10/28/2022: Declaration of Mailing - DECLARATION OF MAILING DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

Declaration of Mailing - DECLARATION OF MAILING DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

10/28/2022: Declaration of Mailing - DECLARATION OF MAILING DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

Declaration of Mailing - DECLARATION OF MAILING DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

10/28/2022: Declaration of Mailing - DECLARATION OF MAILING DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

Declaration of Mailing - DECLARATION OF MAILING DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

10/28/2022: Declaration of Mailing - DECLARATION OF MAILING DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jose Osorio (Plaintiff); As to: Alhambra Furniture Gallery, Inc., a terminated California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/27/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Mailing DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE; Filed by: Jose Osorio (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Mailing DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE; Filed by: Jose Osorio (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Mailing DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE; Filed by: Jose Osorio (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jose Osorio (Plaintiff); As to: Lian Di Zhou (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/27/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Mailing DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE; Filed by: Jose Osorio (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jose Osorio (Plaintiff); As to: Tony Tsai (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/27/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jose Osorio (Plaintiff); As to: Allen Tsai (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/27/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketAddress for Kaveh Sam Elihu, Esq. (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong in Department 28 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Osorio (Plaintiff); As to: Alhambra Furniture Gallery, Inc., a terminated California corporation (Defendant); Lian Di Zhou (Defendant); Tony Tsai (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Osorio (Plaintiff); As to: Alhambra Furniture Gallery, Inc., a terminated California corporation (Defendant); Lian Di Zhou (Defendant); Tony Tsai (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Osorio (Plaintiff); As to: Alhambra Furniture Gallery, Inc., a terminated California corporation (Defendant); Lian Di Zhou (Defendant); Tony Tsai (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIHU KAVEH SAM