This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 14:04:17 (UTC).

JOSE OMAR CASTILLO VS FCA US LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 JOSE OMAR CASTILLO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0759

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO JOSE OMAR

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN Y.

Defendant Attorney

HANSON ERIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/4/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/24/2021

11/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/24/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

11/24/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/10/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Personal Service

11/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/17/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

4/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • Hearing05/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jose Omar Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jose Omar Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docketat 11:08 AM in Department 56; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/24/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jose Omar Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Omar Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Omar Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Omar Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Omar Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANSON ERIN E.