This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 20:15:38 (UTC).

JOSE NUNEZ VS SPS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, A PENNSYLVANIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 JOSE NUNEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SPS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, A PENNSYLVANIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN and ROLF M. TREU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7394

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

ROLF M. TREU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NUNEZ JOSE

Defendants

ASHDOWN MAILE

MORRIS ALEX

PRECISION CASTPARTS CORP.

SPS TECHNOLOGIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANITZ ERIC A.

Defendant Attorney

SCALA CAROLINE SOPHIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/1/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

7/28/2023: Notice - NOTICE CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/17/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)

6/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)

Request - REQUEST TO PRESENT ORAL TESTIMONY

6/12/2023: Request - REQUEST TO PRESENT ORAL TESTIMONY

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BART BAGGETT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SPS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS THE PROCEEDINGS

6/9/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BART BAGGETT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SPS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS THE PROCEEDINGS

Case Management Statement

5/31/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)

4/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JASMINE JAMILI, CSR 13742

4/18/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JASMINE JAMILI, CSR 13742

Notice of Ruling

4/18/2023: Notice of Ruling

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF JOSE NUNEZS WRITTEN OBJECTIONS TO REPLY DECLARATION OF JENNIFER ADAMS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SPS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS TH

4/13/2023: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF JOSE NUNEZS WRITTEN OBJECTIONS TO REPLY DECLARATION OF JENNIFER ADAMS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SPS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS TH

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/11/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/11/2023: Notice - NOTICE CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

4/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/30/2023: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JENNIFER ADAMS IN SUPPORT OF DEF. SPS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/29/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JENNIFER ADAMS IN SUPPORT OF DEF. SPS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEF. SPS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/29/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEF. SPS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/29/2023

3/29/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/29/2023

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2023
  • Hearing10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2023
  • Hearing10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2023
  • Hearing10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 72 - Hon. Joseph Lipnereffective 08/07/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketNotice Continued Case Management Conference, Motion to Compel Arbitration, and Order to Show Cause Hearing; Filed by: Jose Nunez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/24/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/24/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as to all named defendants scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/24/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Precision Castparts Corp. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Precision Castparts Corp., an Oregon corporation to Precision Castparts Corp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketAddress for Eric A. Panitz (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Nunez (Plaintiff); As to: SPS Technologies, LLC, a Pennsylvania limited liability company (Defendant); Precision Castparts Corp., an Oregon corporation (Defendant); Alex Morris (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Nunez (Plaintiff); As to: SPS Technologies, LLC, a Pennsylvania limited liability company (Defendant); Precision Castparts Corp., an Oregon corporation (Defendant); Alex Morris (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Nunez (Plaintiff); As to: SPS Technologies, LLC, a Pennsylvania limited liability company (Defendant); Precision Castparts Corp., an Oregon corporation (Defendant); Alex Morris (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******7394 Hearing Date: April 18, 2023 Dept: 72

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Date: 4/18/23 (9:30 AM)

Case: Jose Nunez v. SPS Technologies, LLC et al. (*******7394)

TENTATIVE RULING :

Defendant SPS Technologies, LLC’s Motion to Compel Arbitration is CONTINUED.

Plaintiff Jose Nunez’s evidentiary objections are OVERRULED. As stated below, plaintiff shall have the opportunity to respond to defendant’s evidence. As a signatory of the arbitration agreement at issue, Jennifer Adams, defendant’s Director of Human Resources, is qualified to lay the foundation for the additional documents submitted in support of the reply. (Jazayeri v. Mao (2009) 174 Cal.App.4th 301, 324 [“any ‘qualified witness’ who is knowledgeable about the documents may lay the foundation for introduction of business records”].)

In this motion, defendant SPS Technologies, LLC seeks to compel arbitration of plaintiff Jose Nunez’s claims against it.

“The moving party bears the burden of producing ‘prima facie evidence of a written agreement to arbitrate the controversy.’ [Citation.]” (Gamboa v. Northeast Community Clinic (2021) 72 Cal.App.5th 158, 165, quoting Rosenthal v. Great Western Fin. Securities Corp. (1996) 14 Cal.4th 394, 413.) Here, defendant meets its burden by attaching a copy of the arbitration agreement purporting to bear plaintiff’s signature. (See Gamboa, 72 Cal.App.5th at 165.) The agreement, titled “Dispute Resolution Policy,” (“Agreement”) is between defendant SPS Technologies, LLC, using its fictitious business name, and plaintiff Jose Nunez. (Olivas Decl. 7 & Ex. A.) Claims arising from plaintiff’s employment with defendant, like the ones asserted in this action, are subject to arbitration. (Ibid. [“Arbitration shall be the sole and exclusive remedy for any dispute, grievance, claim, or controversy of any kind or nature…arising out of, related to, or connected with…your employment relationship with the Company…and the termination of your employment relationship with the Company and which may be brought in state, federal, or local court”].)

“If the moving party meets its initial prima facie burden and the opposing party disputes the agreement, then in the second step, the opposing party bears the burden of producing evidence to challenge the authenticity of the agreement.” (Gamboa, 72 Cal.App.5th at 165.) Here, plaintiff asserts that he never signed the Agreement. (Nunez Decl. 2.) Plaintiff also asserts that the signature that appears on the Agreement is not his signature and does not resemble his usual signature. (Id. 2, 3 & Ex. 1.) Plaintiff meets his burden in opposing the motion. (Gamboa, 72 Cal.App.5th at 165 [The opposing party can do this in several ways. For example, the opposing party may testify under oath or declare under penalty of perjury that…the party never signed or does not remember signing the agreement”].)

“If the opposing party meets its burden of producing evidence, then in the third step, the moving party must establish with admissible evidence a valid arbitration agreement between the parties.” (Ibid.) Defendant responds by stating that the signature on the Agreement is nearly identical to signatures that appear in other documents that plaintiff signed during his employment with defendant. (Adams Decl. 6-12 & Exs. B-G.) Defendant also argues that even if plaintiff did not sign the Agreement, plaintiff accepted its terms by continuing to work for defendant. (See Craig v. Brown & Root (2000) 84 Cal.App.4th 416, 420 [continued employment after receipt of arbitration agreement constitutes implied acceptance of agreement].)

Because defendant submitted the additional evidence in reply, the motion is CONTINUED to at in Department 72 (Stanley Mosk Courthouse). No later than five (5) court days prior to the continued hearing date, plaintiff may file a sur-reply not exceeding 7 pages limited to addressing the evidence and arguments raised in reply. The continued hearing will also consist of an evidentiary hearing for the Court to evaluate the parties’ evidence and determine whether plaintiff signed the Dispute Resolution Policy.