This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 10:26:55 (UTC).

JOSE MUNOZ ET AL VS SBI INDUSTRIES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/03/2017 JOSE MUNOZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SBI INDUSTRIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8262

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MUNOZ MARIA

MUNOZ JOSE

NORDSTROM INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

SBI INDUSTRIES INC

ALVEY MATERIAL HANDLING SYSTEMS INC

SBI INDUSTRIES INC.

ALVEY MATERIAL HANDLING SYSTEMS INC.

SDI INDUSTRIES INC.

INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS LLC DOE1

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS LLC DOE1

Defendant and Cross Defendant

SDI INDUSTRIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DAVIS JOSEPH DANIEL ESQ.

JOSEPH DANIEL DAVIS ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorneys

HENKE ROBERT E. ESQ.

BACKLAR ROGER WILLNER

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

Cross Defendant Attorney

HENKE ROBERT

Other Attorneys

STOUDER S. CHRISTIAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/12/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

9/13/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

Cross-Complaint

11/1/2018: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/1/2018: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/1/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal

12/10/2018: Request for Dismissal

Order

2/7/2019: Order

Notice of Ruling

2/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

6/1/2018: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION

7/12/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION;

4/25/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION;

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

12/21/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

12/21/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/21/2017: Unknown

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/21/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

10/3/2017: SUMMONS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS LLC DOE1 (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES;) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES;); Filed by INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS LLC DOE1 (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND AL...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES); Filed by INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS LLC DOE1 (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by SDI Industries, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Answer; Filed by SDI Industries, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS LLC DOE1 (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jose Munoz (Plaintiff); Maria Munoz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jose Munoz (Plaintiff); Maria Munoz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Receipt-Depository; Filed by Jose Munoz (Plaintiff); Maria Munoz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Jose Munoz (Plaintiff); Maria Munoz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Jose Munoz (Plaintiff); Maria Munoz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC678262    Hearing Date: January 13, 2021    Dept: F49

Dept. F-49

Date: 1-13-21

Case #BC678262

Calendar # 5

Trial Date: 5-3-21

PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOVING PARTY: Defendant, Intelligrated Sytems, LLC

RESPONDING PARTY: Plaintiffs, Jose and Maria Munoz

RELIEF REQUESTED

Motion for Protective Orders

SUMMARY OF ACTION

On October 3, 2017, Plaintiffs filed their complaint for Products Liability, and Loss of Consortium. On December 21, 2017, SDI Industries, Inc. filed a cross-complaint for indemnity, contribution, declaratory relief and duty to defend against Intelligrated Sytems, LLC. On June 8, 2018, Nordstrom, Inc. filed a complaint-in-intervention against SDI Industries, Inc. and Intelligrated Sytems, LLC for recovery of paid Workers’ Compensation benefits. On September 12, 2018, Plaintiffs substituted in Intelligrated Sytems, LLC for Doe 1. On November 1, 2018, Intelligrated Sytems, LLC filed a cross-complaint for indemnity and declaratory relief against SDI Industries.

On December 10, 2018, SDI Industries filed a partial dismissal of it’s cross-complaint. On March 9, 2020, the court executed a stipulation allowing for the filing of a first amended complaint for product liability, loss of consortium, and negligence. On May 4, 2020, Nordtrom dismissed its complaint in intervention against Intelligrated Sytems, LLC.

On June 29, 2020, Department 31 transferred the action to Department 47. Plaintiffs filed a peremptory challenge on July 16, 2020, thereby leading to reassignment to Department 49 on July 22, 2020.

RULING: Moot/Off-Calendar

Defendant Intelligrated Sytems, LLC move for a protective order on the methods employed for certain depositions of expert witnesses, and to limit the conduct of Plaintiffs’ counsel, Joseph Davis. Plaintiffs in opposition request the court deny the motion given the execution of a stipulation for a protective order on the remaining depositions in the subject action. Defendant in reply denies that the motion is moot, and raises arguments regarding expert witness fees owed, and a request for monetary sanctions. Counsel also reiterates the “abhorrent” behavior of attorney Joseph Davis at deposition.

On December 28, 2020, the court entered the stipulation of the parties for the appointment of a referee for supervision of the depositions. The stipulation exclusively and completely delegates all authority to the referee. Payment for expert witness fees and conduct of counsel constitutes issues related to said depositions. Nothing in the stipulation reserves any rights for the court to address. (Code Civ. Proc., 639, subd. (a)(5), (c-d).) Should the referee decline to consider any and all issues, the referee may indicate as much in the report, which may be presented to the court for consideration. The court otherwise declines to consider any further arguments. The stipulation renders the requested motion moot, and the court therefore takes the motion off-calendar.

Moving Party to give notice.

Case Number: BC678262    Hearing Date: June 29, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOSE MUNOZ, ET AL.,

Plaintiff,

v.

SBI INDUSTRIES, INC., ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC678262

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 31 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT, JUDGE MELVIN D. SANDVIG presiding in DEPT. F47 of the Chatsworth Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: June 29, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC678262    Hearing Date: March 11, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOSE MUNOZ, ET AL.,

Plaintiff,

v.

SBI INDUSTRIES, INC., ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC678262

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 31 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT, JUDGE MELVIN D. SANDVIG presiding in DEPT. F47 of the Chatsworth Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: March 11, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SDI Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nordstrom, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOUDER S. CHRISTIAN ESQ.