This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 09:41:25 (UTC).

JOSE MONTES VS ALLIED RESTORATION SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 JOSE MONTES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ALLIED RESTORATION SERVICES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0731

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTES JOSE

Defendants

ALLIED RESTORATION SERVICES INC.

BONILLA ANGIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCARDIGLI NICHOLAS FOON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/3/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/3/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • Hearing01/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Hearing01/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jose Montes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Montes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Montes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Montes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIED RESTORATION SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCARDIGLI, NICHOLAS J.