This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:18:23 (UTC).

JOSE MEZA VS. ALL AMERICAN DESIGN INC.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 JOSE MEZA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALL AMERICAN DESIGN INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and BRIAN F. GASDIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6347

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

BRIAN F. GASDIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEZA JOSE

Defendants

ALL AMERICAN DESIGN INC.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (DOE 1)

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MADAEN BAHRAM LAW OFFICES OF

MADAEN ESQ. BAHRAM

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

6/2/2017: Unknown

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/2/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

6/2/2017: Summons

Unknown

8/16/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

11/3/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/13/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/21/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

5/16/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

5/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/13/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/21/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/17/2019: Minute Order

Motion for Leave

2/20/2019: Motion for Leave

Order

5/14/2019: Order

Minute Order

5/14/2019: Minute Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Motion to Leave to Amend The Complaint) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Order (re: hearing of 5/14/19); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion to Leave to Amend...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Motion for Leave ( to Amend the Complaint); Filed by JOSE MEZA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (regarding service/answer/responsive pleading/default as to defendant County of Los Angeles) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: regarding service/answer/responsive p...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's failure to appear on 9/13/18) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiff's failure to ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F; Status Conference (Status Conference; Not held-No appearances) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • Default Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JOSE MEZA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 07/20/17 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by JOSE MEZA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSE MEZA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL AMERICAN DESIGN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MADAEN, BAHRAM