This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2020 at 18:56:36 (UTC).

JOSE MEZA ET AL VS JENNA CLAIRE LATTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 JOSE MEZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JENNA CLAIRE LATTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3369

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

QUIROZ ISELA

MEZA JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

LATTER JENNA CLAIRE

LATTER EUGENE

DOES 1 TO 100

Minor and Not Classified By Court

MEZA AXEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

CHAMBERS GARY L. ESQ.

CHAMBERS GARY LEE ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JUAN DELGADO ESQ.

DELGADO JUAN CARLOS

MARKHAM KEEVIL LEE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

3/10/2020: Notice of Settlement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #8

2/25/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #8

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1

2/25/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

2/26/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS AT TIME OF THIS HEARING

2/21/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS AT TIME OF THIS HEARING

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE ANY ARGUMENT PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MITIGATE HER DAMAGES BY NOT TREATING THROUGH INSURANCE OR MEDICARE/MEDICAL/MEDICAID

2/21/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE ANY ARGUMENT PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MITIGATE HER DAMAGES BY NOT TREATING THROUGH INSURANCE OR MEDICARE/MEDICAL/MEDICAID

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE OF MINOR AXEL MEZA

1/31/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE OF MINOR AXEL MEZA

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GARY L. CHAMBERS RE PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE OF MINOR AXEL MEZA

2/5/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GARY L. CHAMBERS RE PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE OF MINOR AXEL MEZA

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE) OF 01/21/2020

1/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE) OF 01/21/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION) OF 12/06/2019

12/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION) OF 12/06/2019

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4

11/12/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3

11/12/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

11/12/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

Association of Attorney

11/20/2019: Association of Attorney

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/20/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

4/2/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2/8/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • Hearing02/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Hearing09/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Jose Meza (Plaintiff); Isela Quiroz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (/ Proof of deposit into blocked account) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal / Proof of deposit into blo...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (/ Proof of deposit into blocked account) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 09:11 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re April 17, 2020)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re April 17, 2020) of 04/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Jose Meza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Meza (Plaintiff); Isela Quiroz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693369    Hearing Date: February 28, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

JOSE MEZA, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

jenna claire latter, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC693369

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Isela Quiroz (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Axel Meza (“Claimant”) and determines the settlement is fair and reasonable. Petitioner has addressed the issues the Court previously identified. The Court previously held a hearing on this matter. Also, because of the settlement amount, this petition could have been filed as an expedited petition, which does not require a hearing. Therefore, the Court approves the settlement and takes the hearing off-calendar. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re: Opening of Blocked Account and Dismissal for April 17, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.

DATED: February 28, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC693369    Hearing Date: January 23, 2020    Dept: 5

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

JOSE MEZA, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

JENNA CLAIRE LATTER, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC693369

Hearing Date: January 23, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

The Court continues the hearing on the petition for the following reasons:

1. There is no proof of service for the petition and proposed orders. Nor is there any proof of service indicating that Petitioner provided notice of the continued hearing date. Therefore, the Court cannot hear this petition on January 23, 2020.

2. The petition states that Jose Meza is settling this action for $35,000. However, the petition does not reference the outcome of the litigation involving Petitioner Isela Quiroz, who also is a plaintiff in this case. The petition must indicate whether is she is resolving her claims and the terms of any settlement, including whether Plaintiffs’ counsel will receive fees from that settlement. Petitioner need not file a new petition on this issue, but instead may supplement the record with a declaration from counsel.

This hearing is continued to February 28, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The Court orders Petitioner to serve the petition and proposed orders, as well as notice of the hearing, on all parties and to file proof of service with the Court.

DATED: January 23, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC693369    Hearing Date: December 20, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

JOSE MEZA, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

jenna claire latter, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC693369

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

On December 6, 2019, the Court identified certain issue with the petition by Petitioner Isela Quiroz (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Axel Meza (“Claimant”). The Court continued the matter to December 20, 2019, to afford Petitioner an opportunity to correct these issues. Petitioner has not done so. Therefore, the Court continues the hearing on this petition to January 23, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. In the interim, Petitioner must correct the following issues:

1. In Section 19(c) of the petition, Petitioner states that counsel for Claimant has not received any other compensation in connection with this matter. That appears to be incorrect, as counsel for Claimant also represents Plaintiff Jose Meza, who settled his claims in this action for $35,000. Further, in section 19(e) of the petition Petitioner states that counsel for Claimant does not represent any other parties to this litigation, which is incorrect. Therefore, Petitioner must file a new petition correcting these issues.

2. Petitioner did not provide a proposed order approving the settlement. Petitioner must do so.

3. Petitioner did not provide a proposed order authorizing the funds to be deposited into a blocked account. Petitioner must do so.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court continues the hearing on Petitioner’s petition to approve the settlement to January 23, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. to afford Petitioner an opportunity to correct these issues. Petitioner shall provide notice.

DATED: December 19, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC693369    Hearing Date: December 10, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

JOSE MEZA, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

jenna claire latter, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC693369

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Isela Quiroz (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Axel Meza (“Claimant”) and continues the matter to December 20, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Petitioner must do the following:

1. In Section 19(c) of the petition, Petitioner states that counsel for Claimant has not received any other compensation in connection with this matter. That appears to be incorrect, as counsel for Claimant also represents Plaintiff Jose Meza, who settled his claims in this action for $35,000. Further, in section 19(e) of the petition Petitioner states that counsel for Claimant does not represent any other parties to this litigation, which is incorrect. Therefore, Petitioner must file a new petition correcting these issues.

2. Petitioner did not provide a proposed order approving the settlement. Petitioner must do so.

3. Petitioner did not provide a proposed order authorizing the funds to be deposited into a blocked account. Petitioner must do so.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court continues the hearing on Petitioner’s petition to approve the settlement to December 20, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. to afford Petitioner an opportunity to correct these issues. Petitioner shall provide notice.

DATED: December 6, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court