This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2023 at 06:12:43 (UTC).

JOSE MENDEZ VS NATIONAL FREIGHT INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 JOSE MENDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATIONAL FREIGHT INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SERENA R. MURILLO, ANTHONY MOHR and STEVEN A. ELLIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5973

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SERENA R. MURILLO

ANTHONY MOHR

STEVEN A. ELLIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDEZ JOSE

Defendants

LYONS MATTHEW DEAN

NATIONAL FREIGHT INC.

NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS LLC DBA NFI TRANSPORTATION

Not Classified By Court

CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABDOULIN ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

DUBRAWSKI ESQ PETER

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SOLEIMANPOUR MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

7/17/2023: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY MONETARY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ...)

7/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY MONETARY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ...)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

7/14/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

7/13/2023: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial

1/23/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

1/23/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/23/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE.) OF 10/05/2021

10/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE.) OF 10/05/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE.)

10/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE.)

Notice of Related Case

7/28/2021: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/22/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/14/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2024
  • Hearing07/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2024
  • Hearing06/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2024
  • Hearing05/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JOSE MENDEZ on 07/14/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to NATIONAL FREIGHT INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: why monetary sanctions should not be ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: why monetary sanctions should not be imposed due to Plaintiffs failure to file a proof of service of the summons and complaint scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 07/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 07/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOSE MENDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: NATIONAL FREIGHT INC. (Defendant); NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS LLC (Defendant); MATTHEW DEAN LYONS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOSE MENDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: NATIONAL FREIGHT INC. (Defendant); NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS LLC (Defendant); MATTHEW DEAN LYONS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSE MENDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: NATIONAL FREIGHT INC. (Defendant); NFI INTERACTIVE LOGISTICS LLC (Defendant); MATTHEW DEAN LYONS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less