Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 07:02:18 (UTC).

JOSE MAURICIO GAITAN, ET AL. VS TONY HAN, INDIVIDUALLY AND IN HIS CAPACITY AS A TRUSTEE OF THE HYON KYONG KIM LIVING TRUST AND THE HYON KYONG KIM MARITAL TRU

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 JOSE MAURICIO GAITAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TONY HAN, INDIVIDUALLY AND IN HIS CAPACITY AS A TRUSTEE OF THE HYON KYONG KIM LIVING TRUST AND THE HYON KYONG KIM MARITAL TRU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3979

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRUZ ELMER

CRUZ SANDRA

SANCHEZ ANA

FLORES ADRIANA

HERNANDEZ JAVIER

MORAN ANA BEATRIZ

BRANDON SALGADO BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM SANDRA CRUZ

BOLANOS MARTA GLADYS

TOLEDO VICTOR

CASTRO RUPERTO

LUCIANO QUERO BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM DOROTEA QUERO-CHAVEZ

GARCIA MARIO

HERNANDEZ BELEN MARIA

AMAYA DERMAN

CRUZ HILMA

KAREN A. CANELA BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ADRIANA FLORES

Defendants

SMITH BRANDON

DYNASTY STAR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THE ESTATE OF HYON KYONG KIM A DECEASED INDIVIDUAL

NAMHEE HAN GILHULY INDIVIDUALLY AND IN HER CAPACITY AS A TRUSTEE OF THE HYON KYONG KIM LIVING TRUST AND THE HYON KYONG KIM MARITAL TRUST

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MILLER KIMBERLEE A.

MILLER KIMBERLEE

Defendant Attorneys

YARLING MATTHEW JOSEPH

SCHMADEKA LARRY ROBERT

MARDYROSIAN LINET

WHITE WILLIAM AUSTIN

CRITCHLOW EVAN JAMES

KOBYLECKI ELAINE

BIRKEL JULIA LYNN

GARCIA AMANDA ASHLEY

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/10/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SOLEYBI

5/19/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SOLEYBI

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/25/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/08/2021

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/08/2021

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/9/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); HEA...)

4/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); HEA...)

Answer

12/30/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/19/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

1/20/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/20/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT LANDPAC REALTY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

2/24/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT LANDPAC REALTY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT BEACH FRONT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

2/24/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT BEACH FRONT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

3/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/05/2021

3/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/05/2021

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • Hearing05/02/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Hearing04/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Hearing12/09/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Beach Front Property Management, Inc., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Landpac Realty, a real estate agency (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Dynasty Star LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Jose Mauricio Gaitan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 3:11 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Luciano); Filed by Jose Mauricio Gaitan (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lemus (Plaintiff); Amanda Herrera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Derman); Filed by Jose Mauricio Gaitan (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lemus (Plaintiff); Amanda Herrera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Brandon); Filed by Jose Mauricio Gaitan (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lemus (Plaintiff); Amanda Herrera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Melvin); Filed by Jose Mauricio Gaitan (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lemus (Plaintiff); Amanda Herrera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Karen); Filed by Jose Mauricio Gaitan (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lemus (Plaintiff); Amanda Herrera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Binhiza); Filed by Jose Mauricio Gaitan (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lemus (Plaintiff); Amanda Herrera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jonathan); Filed by Jose Mauricio Gaitan (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lemus (Plaintiff); Amanda Herrera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Mauricio Gaitan (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lemus (Plaintiff); Amanda Herrera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Mauricio Gaitan (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lemus (Plaintiff); Amanda Herrera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DYNASTY STAR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRITCHLOW EVAN JAMES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE WILLIAM AUSTIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YARLING MATTHEW