This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 06:22:52 (UTC).

JOSE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO VS LAD CARSON-N, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 JOSE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against LAD CARSON-N, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1392

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ ANGUIANO JOSE

Defendants

LAD CARSON-N LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA CARSON NISSAN

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

Defendant Attorneys

LEACH BRIAN E

THOMAS ANTHONY S

PETROSYAN ASLAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

11/22/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/22/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

12/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO, JOSE V. NNA NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (4.13.23)

12/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO, JOSE V. NNA NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (4.13.23)

Answer

12/22/2022: Answer

Answer

12/22/2022: Answer

Answer

12/28/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); As to: JOSE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: LAD CARSON-N, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice Martinez Anguiano, Jose v. NNA Notice of Case Management Conference (4.13.23); Filed by: JOSE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); As to: LAD CARSON-N, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JOSE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); As to: LAD CARSON-N, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JOSE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); As to: LAD CARSON-N, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOSE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); As to: LAD CARSON-N, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOSE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); As to: LAD CARSON-N, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: JOSE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); As to: LAD CARSON-N, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSE MARTINEZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); As to: LAD CARSON-N, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAD CARSON-N LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRNOS ROGER