This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 04:16:06 (UTC).

JOSE MANUEL GARCIA JUAREZ VS MORBIN ZOLIZ

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 JOSE MANUEL GARCIA JUAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MORBIN ZOLIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8040

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JUAREZ JOSE MANUEL GARCIA

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

ZOLIZ MORBIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MAURO FIORE JR.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/26/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

12/26/2017: SUMMONS

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

3/13/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jose Manuel Garcia Juarez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Jose Manuel Garcia Juarez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Manuel Garcia Juarez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8040    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOSE MANUEL GARCIA JUAREZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

MORBIN ZOLIZ, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****8040

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 16, 2019

Plaintiff, Jose Manuel Garcia Juarez filed this action against Defendant, Morbin Zoliz for damages arising out of an automobile accident.  Plaintiff filed the complaint on 12/16/17.  Plaintiff filed proof of service of the summons and complaint on Defendant on 3/13/18.  Defendant has not appeared, and Plaintiff has not had his default entered.   Plaintiff failed to appear at the 6/11/19 FSC or the 6/26/19 trial.  On 6/26/19, the Court dismissed the case.

At this time, Plaintiff moves to set aside the dismissal.  Plaintiff’s attorney declares the failure to appear at the FSC and trial was due to an oversight; Plaintiff also declares a request for entry of default was filed, but default has not been entered; notably, the request is purportedly attached as Exhibit A to the moving papers, but there are no exhibits to the moving papers.  The motion is granted.  CCP ;473(b). 

The Court sets an OSC re: entry of default for Tuesday, 2/18/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.