This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 01:00:54 (UTC).

JOSE MACIAS VS MAR PIZZA INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 JOSE MACIAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MAR PIZZA INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3364

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACIAS JOSE

Defendants

MAR PIZZA INC.

OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY

MARTINEZ GERARDO

ETAL DBA DOMINO'S PIZZA

NORTH AMERICAN RISK SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEMTOUB MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

CARROLL KYLE P.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

10/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 10/29/2021

10/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 10/29/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL

7/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

7/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

7/14/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

7/27/2021: Answer

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/28/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

7/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

Request for Dismissal

8/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

8/3/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY, NORTH AMERICAN RISK SERVICES INC. NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR

8/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY, NORTH AMERICAN RISK SERVICES INC. NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

PI General Order

10/24/2019: PI General Order

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Hearing01/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference) of 10/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by MAR Pizza Inc. (Defendant); Etal (Defendant); Gerardo Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Macias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Macias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Macias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH AMERICAN RISK SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MAR PIZZA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where DOMINOS PIZZA LLC is a litigant