This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2021 at 01:06:44 (UTC).

JOSE M. MIRANDA, ET AL. VS XAVIER BACERRA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 JOSE M MIRANDA filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against XAVIER BACERRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MEL RED RECANA, ELAINE LU and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9825

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MEL RED RECANA

ELAINE LU

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIRANDA JOSE M.

CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY

Defendants

SIERRA MOUNTAIN MEDICAL

CLOVER SURGICAL CENTER

VELEZ ANTERO A. M D

STEINBRECHER ALAN

BACERRA XAVIER

CLOVER MEDICAL GROUP

CLINICA MEDICA DE 24 HORAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKERMAN PAUL

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARDS MEGAN ANNE

YEN JERRY TONGWEI

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO A RECUSAL)

4/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO A RECUSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DISCLOSURE)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DISCLOSURE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/09/2020

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/09/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

12/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/04/2020

12/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/04/2020

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/29/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/1/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/1/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

9/16/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION OF DEFENDANT ALAN STEINBRECHER, CHAIRMAN OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES TO DEMURRER

8/18/2020: Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION OF DEFENDANT ALAN STEINBRECHER, CHAIRMAN OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES TO DEMURRER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

8/17/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Personal Service

8/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/29/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/29/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/26/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (by Defendant Xavier Becerra to Plaintiff's Complaint) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 2:31 PM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Disclosure) of 05/25/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Disclosure)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jose M. Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:59 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment Pursuant to a Recusal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 2:53 PM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOrder (Re: Recusal); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Xavier Bacerra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint); Filed by Alan Steinbrecher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose M. Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose M. Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose M. Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose M. Miranda (Plaintiff); Carpenter, Zuckerman & Rowley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose M. Miranda (Plaintiff); Carpenter, Zuckerman & Rowley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where SIERRA MOUNTAIN MEDICAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.