This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/05/2022 at 15:52:39 (UTC).

JOSE LUIS JIMENEZ VS SHABU STORY, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 JOSE LUIS JIMENEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SHABU STORY, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2282

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMENEZ JOSE LUIS

Defendant

SHABU STORY INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEZA CONTRERAS NATHALIE

Defendant Attorney

DEVLING MADONNA L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/11/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/2/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/2/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Shabu Story, Inc., A CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jose Luis Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Luis Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Luis Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Luis Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVLING, MADONNA