This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2021 at 14:40:25 (UTC).

JOSE LUIS GONSALES VS RICARDO HERNANDEZ CERVA

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 JOSE LUIS GONSALES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICARDO HERNANDEZ CERVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5077

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONSALES JOSE LUIS

Defendant

CERVA RICARDO HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASSERMAN ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

KABIR ROSE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/29/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/6/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/21/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2024
  • Hearing04/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Hearing10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Hearing10/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ricardo Hernandez Cerva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ricardo Hernandez Cerva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Luis Gonsales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Luis Gonsales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Luis Gonsales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Luis Gonsales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KABIR, ROSE