This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2019 at 20:46:25 (UTC).

JOSE LUIS CONTRERAS ET AL VS NESTOR GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 04/19/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by JOSE LUIS CONTRERAS against NESTOR GOMEZ in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2930

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LOPEZ FERNANDO

CONTRERAS JOSE LUIS

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

GOMEZ NESTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHAYAN KAMYAR R. ESQ.

SHAYAN KAMYAR R

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SEROPIAN ARA O. ESQ.

FORRESTER PERRY MATTHEW ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/20/2019: Request for Dismissal

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

10/15/2019: Motion for Stay of Proceedings

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

7/22/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/15/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/28/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice - Notice of Handling Attorney Change

11/30/2018: Notice - Notice of Handling Attorney Change

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

5/31/2018: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/31/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

4/19/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE.

4/19/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • Hearing03/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Hearing03/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Hearing12/18/2019 at 13:30 PM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jose Luis Contreras (Plaintiff); Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketMotion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by Jose Luis Contreras (Plaintiff); Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order ([PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)); Filed by Nestor Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Nestor Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Nestor Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nestor Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Nestor Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Luis Contreras (Plaintiff); Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Luis Contreras (Plaintiff); Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Luis Contreras (Plaintiff); Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC702930    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

jose luis contreras, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

nestor gomez, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC702930

Hearing Date: December 18, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to stay

Plaintiff Fernando Lopez (“Plaintiff”) moves for a stay of this action due to his military service. Per Military and Veterans Code section 403, subdivision (a), “At any stage in any action or proceeding in which a service member is involved, either as plaintiff or defendant, during a period of military service or within 120 days thereafter, the court may, in its discretion on its own motion, and shall, on application to it by the service member or some person on his or her behalf, stay the action or proceeding unless, in the opinion of the court, the ability of the plaintiff to prosecute the action or the defendant to conduct his or her defense is not materially affected by reason of his or her military service.” (Mil. & Vet. Code, § 403, subd. (a).) Defendants do not oppose the motion. Therefore, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court grants Plaintiff’s motion to stay the case. The Court sets a Status Conference Re: Stay or, in the alternative, a Trial Setting Conference for September 28, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. Any party who does not appear shall submit to any decision the Court makes on whether to continue the stay and, if not, on what date to set the final status conference and trial. Plaintiff shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 18, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court