This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 01:20:05 (UTC).

JOSE LOPEZ VS UNIVERSAL MOLDING COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 JOSE LOPEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against UNIVERSAL MOLDING COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7193

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LOPEZ JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

INTERNATIONAL ALUMINUM CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

UNIVERSAL MOLDING COMPANY

MUNOZ ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SEZGIN KHOUSADIAN LLP

SEZGIN ARTHUR

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JACKSON JAMES T. ESQ.

JACKSON JAMES THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/23/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/29/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/29/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

5/29/2018: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

5/31/2018: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

Minute Order

6/7/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

9/10/2018: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

Minute Order

9/12/2018: Minute Order

Motion for Order

1/15/2019: Motion for Order

Minute Order

2/13/2019: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

2/14/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/27/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

3/27/2019: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

6/6/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

6/6/2019: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS

3/8/2018: SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/9/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 58; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Conference (ReMediation Setting) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Universal Molding Company (Defendant); International Aluminum Corporation (Defendant); Antonio Munoz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Conference Re: Mediation Setting)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for a Court Ordered Mental Exam) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 58; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jose Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) DISABILITY HARASSMENT, VIOLATION OF CAL. GOV'T CODE 12940 ET SEQ. ("FEHA"); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL MOLDING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEZGIN ARTHUR